U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00568
  • Case Name: Peregrine Falcon LLC et al v. Piaggio America, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Expedite]
  • April 09, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • April 08, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 02, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Exclude]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 17, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • September 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2019: [Withdraw]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Supplement]
  • July 26, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 07, 2019: [Supplement]
  • June 07, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 14, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 30, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 20, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 06, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 03, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 03, 2018: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 23, 2018: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • July 19, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 16, 2018: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Renew]
  • July 11, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Renew]
  • June 14, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Intervene]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 23, 2016: [Stay]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 04, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2016: [1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 12, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 10, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 29, 2016: [Intervene]
  • January 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 19, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 19, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 15, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 09, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 07, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.