U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00587
  • Case Name: Gomez v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [~Util - Case Reopened]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Reopen Case]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 19, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • October 19, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 07, 2016: [Consent Filed]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 21, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.