U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00592
  • Case Name: AT&T Corp v. POINTE PARTNERS, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Status Report]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Status Report]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 22, 2015: [Supplement]
  • December 22, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 22, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.