U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00590
  • Case Name: Arledge v. Ada County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [USCA Memorandum]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order]
  • September 29, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 24, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • December 24, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 24, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.