U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00594
  • Case Name: Sapp v. Ada County Medical et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Trial]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 22, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Trial]
  • May 08, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 06, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • April 06, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 01, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • August 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 22, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 05, 2016: [Request]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 05, 2016: [Return Mail]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 28, 2015: [Complaint]
  • December 28, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 28, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.