U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00342
  • Case Name: Moreno v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
  • March 31, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 26, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 23, 2017: [Errata]
  • January 19, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 23, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 23, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 10, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 04, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 29, 2015: [Errata]
  • December 29, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 29, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.