U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00595
  • Case Name: Fleenor v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [USCA Order]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 07, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Praecipe]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 01, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • April 01, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • December 30, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 30, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 30, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 30, 2015: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.