U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00596
  • Case Name: Storm v. Kempf et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Receipt]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • April 03, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • December 13, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 29, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Status Report]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 01, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 06, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 30, 2015: [Complaint]
  • December 30, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 30, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 30, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.