U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00598
  • Case Name: Lynch v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 15, 2017: [Letter]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 15, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • June 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Receipt]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 31, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.