U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00600
  • Case Name: Panuski v. MassMutual Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 24, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 11, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 01, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 06, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.