U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00001
  • Case Name: American Wild Horse Preservation Campaign et al v. Jewell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2018: [Settlement Agreement]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 12, 2018: [Stay]
  • January 12, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 12, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 01, 2017: [Administrative Record]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 02, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 01, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 04, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 04, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.