U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Clear Wireless, LLC v. Mountain State Cellular, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2017: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 06, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 05, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 03, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • June 22, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 20, 2017: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • June 20, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 20, 2017: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • June 09, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2017: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • June 05, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 05, 2017: [Trial Brief]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 26, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 26, 2017: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • May 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 12, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order]
  • January 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Statement]
  • December 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • August 12, 2016: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 06, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 11, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 11, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 04, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.