U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00349
  • Case Name: Bonnell v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 28, 2016: [Remand]
  • June 21, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 20, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 23, 2016: [Declaration]
  • May 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • March 23, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 04, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.