U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Clarke v. ALJEX Software, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 07, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • February 07, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 08, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 19, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 28, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 13, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 13, 2017: [Statement]
  • November 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2017: [Statement]
  • October 27, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 26, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • September 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 15, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • September 01, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 20, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 18, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 12, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 06, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 06, 2016: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.