U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Moore v. Barttlet et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 06, 2017: [USCA Memorandum]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 15, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 07, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 06, 2016: [Reconsideration]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 29, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2016: [Letter]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Request]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 06, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 06, 2016: [Complaint]
  • January 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.