U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Idahoan Foods, LLC v. Basic American, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 07, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • January 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.