U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Coladonato v. National Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 04, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 01, 2017: [Errata]
  • March 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [ADR Plan]
  • February 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 17, 2017: [Report of Mediation]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 28, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 11, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order]
  • March 10, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 22, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • January 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 07, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 07, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 06, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 06, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.