U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Sherwood v. BNSF Railway Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 30, 2019: [Appeal Transcript]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • April 29, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 29, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 19, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2019: [Special Verdict Form]
  • March 18, 2019: [Jury Notes]
  • March 18, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 15, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 14, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 14, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 13, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 13, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 13, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 13, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 13, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 12, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 12, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 12, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 11, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 10, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 10, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 10, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 08, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 07, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 07, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 07, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 06, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 06, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 05, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 05, 2019: [Errata]
  • March 05, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • March 04, 2019: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 03, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 01, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 27, 2019: [Declaration]
  • February 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 22, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2019: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • February 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 15, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 15, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • February 12, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • February 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 06, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 05, 2019: [Declaration]
  • February 05, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • February 05, 2019: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • February 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 05, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 05, 2019: [Renew]
  • February 05, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 05, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 01, 2019: [Renew]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2019: [Status Report]
  • January 16, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Order]
  • July 06, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Discovery Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • May 23, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 18, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Clarify]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Withdraw]
  • March 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 17, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • November 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 14, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 01, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 18, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 17, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 16, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Statement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 12, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 12, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 12, 2017: [Exclude]
  • October 11, 2017: [Errata]
  • October 11, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 08, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 06, 2017: [Statement]
  • October 06, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Exclude]
  • September 20, 2017: [Compel]
  • September 15, 2017: [Relief]
  • September 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2017: [Report of Mediation]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • June 09, 2016: [Expedite]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 15, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 02, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 10, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 10, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.