U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Bacon v. Dakota Southern Railway Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 12, 2018: [Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 08, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [ADR Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [ADR Plan]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 18, 2016: [Errata]
  • February 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 08, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.