U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Wilderness Watch et al v. Vilsack et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 26, 2020: [Stay]
  • May 26, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 01, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [USCA Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 09, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 09, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • January 05, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 05, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2018: [Appeal Transcript]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 22, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • December 05, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 05, 2017: [Stay]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Appeal Transcript Request]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 31, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 27, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • May 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Strike]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Joinder]
  • April 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2016: [Strike]
  • April 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 04, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 12, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • January 12, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 08, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.