U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Cherry v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Request]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 07, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.