U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00011
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Robertson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 30, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 30, 2016: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2016: [In Limine]
  • August 05, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 31, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 13, 2016: [Relief]
  • May 13, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • April 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.