U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Price v. Mike & Tristan Geddes Dairy, LLC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 25, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 21, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 02, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 17, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.