U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Ankrom v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 06, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • April 18, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 02, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 22, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • January 22, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 11, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 11, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.