U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Catlin v. Porn Calling Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Letter]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Status Report]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Issuance]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Issuance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.