U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Streamline Precision Contracting LLC v. Intersystems International Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.