U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Bench v. Unifund CCR, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 20, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2016: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • May 02, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 16, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 02, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.