U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Crystal Springs Hydroelectric, L.P. v. CyberPower Systems (USA), Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 09, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 26, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • December 16, 2016: [Protective Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 19, 2016: [Errata]
  • February 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 01, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 14, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 14, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 14, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 14, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 14, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.