U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Idaho Conservation League et al v. U.S. Forest Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 01, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 16, 2016: [Strike]
  • May 16, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 03, 2016: [Strike]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 27, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 26, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Litigation Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 30, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 12, 2016: [Intervene]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 25, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 22, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.