U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Beavers v. Little
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Disqualify Judge]
  • November 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 01, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 29, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Errata]
  • July 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 11, 2017: [Stay]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • June 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 15, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.