U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Van Atta et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 09, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 09, 2017: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 01, 2017: [Stay]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Errata]
  • December 28, 2016: [Stay]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Staying Case]
  • August 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • June 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 10, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • February 09, 2016: [Return Mail]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 26, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order]
  • January 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 20, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.