U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00030
  • Case Name: MERIDIAN CINEMAS, LLC v. Powell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 09, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 07, 2016: [Status Report]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order Staying Case]
  • February 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • February 02, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 19, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.