U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Meister v. Kempf et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 11, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order to Transport]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 26, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 17, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 16, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Discovery]
  • July 12, 2016: [Stay]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 24, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 02, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • June 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Show Cause]
  • April 12, 2016: [Receipt]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 29, 2016: [Hearing]
  • March 22, 2016: [Errata]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 01, 2016: [Supplement]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 20, 2016: [Complaint]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.