U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Pocatello Hospital LLC v. Corizon LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Certify]
  • June 13, 2017: [Certify]
  • June 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 17, 2017: [Stay]
  • February 17, 2017: [Certify]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 05, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 21, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 21, 2016: [Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 22, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.