U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Newman et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • June 27, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 09, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 20, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2016: [Errata]
  • May 02, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Remand]
  • April 22, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2016: [Joinder]
  • April 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 28, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 21, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 05, 2016: [Change Venue]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 26, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 22, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • January 20, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.