U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Old Republic Insurance Company v. High Range Aviation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 20, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • December 19, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Order]
  • January 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.