U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Melaleuca, Inc. et al v. Marquis Aurbach Coffing, P.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 14, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 14, 2016: [Stay]
  • March 14, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 14, 2016: [Transfer Case]
  • March 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 08, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.