U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Moras v. NPC International, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Stipulation and Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 07, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.