U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. Obama et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Supplement]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 26, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.