U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Salazar v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 02, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 02, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order to Transport]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 19, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 12, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 13, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 13, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Objection]
  • November 06, 2018: [Stay]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • October 16, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 15, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Request]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Issuance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Quash]
  • May 17, 2017: [Issuance]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Stay]
  • February 10, 2017: [Produce]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Letter]
  • December 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 23, 2016: [Stay]
  • June 23, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 27, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 07, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Receipt]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 27, 2016: [Complaint]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.