U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Wall v. United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service Northern Region One et
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 02, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 19, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 27, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 27, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 27, 2016: [Receipt]
  • January 27, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.