U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Lovelace v. Sandy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [USCA Memorandum]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 28, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • August 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2016: [Supplement]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • July 07, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 07, 2016: [Reassign Case]
  • July 07, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 07, 2016: [Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Letter]
  • May 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Letter]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 11, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 27, 2016: [Complaint]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.