U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Soderberg v. City of McCall et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 05, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Response (generic)]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2017: [Declaration]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Strike]
  • April 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • April 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 31, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 17, 2017: [Vacate]
  • March 16, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 03, 2016: [Receipt]
  • February 01, 2016: [Litigation Order]
January, 2016
  • January 30, 2016: [Complaint]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • January 28, 2016: [Bond]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.