U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00046
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Harvey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Confirm]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Disclosure]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • June 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Clarify]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Status Report]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Supplement]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 29, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Response (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Response (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 06, 2017: [Strike]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [Receipt]
  • October 20, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 19, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 12, 2017: [Stay]
  • October 05, 2017: [Response (generic)]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order]
  • September 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 01, 2017: [Reconsideration]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • August 09, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • July 03, 2017: [Change Venue]
  • July 03, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Stay]
  • February 16, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 17, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • January 04, 2017: [Stay]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Set Aside Default]
  • October 18, 2016: [Reconsideration]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 08, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • September 08, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Entry of Default]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 08, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 06, 2016: [Disclosure]
  • July 06, 2016: [Compel]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Strike]
  • May 05, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 05, 2016: [Jury Demand]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Change Venue]
  • April 18, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Litigation Order]
  • January 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.