U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Schroeder et al v. Dupage County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Reopen Case]
  • March 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 02, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Return Mail]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.