U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Adaptive Tactical, LLC v. FAB Manufacturing & Import of Industrial Equipment Ltd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • February 17, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 10, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • December 08, 2016: [Expedite]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • September 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 07, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 30, 2016: [Expedite]
  • August 30, 2016: [Stay]
  • August 30, 2016: [Strike]
  • August 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • July 29, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 13, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 07, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 27, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Status Report]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • February 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 01, 2016: [Litigation Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.