U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Miskin Scraper Works, Inc. v. CNA Financial Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 11, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 24, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 24, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 02, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Summons Issued]
January, 2016
  • January 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 30, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.