U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Fullmer et al v. Bingham County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 08, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 08, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 02, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.