U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Sierra v. Crocket
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2016: [Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Produce]
  • September 23, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2016: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Receipt]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 02, 2016: [Complaint]
  • February 02, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 02, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.