U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Lynch v. North American Company for Life and Health Insurance et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 07, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 09, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 09, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • June 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 08, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 08, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 08, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2017: [Statement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order]
  • January 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 26, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 13, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 12, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 19, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 26, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 07, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 04, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Counterclaim]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 10, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 08, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 04, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.